U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chislom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Transcript]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 17, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 07, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 06, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 16, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 16, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • September 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • September 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 22, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • September 22, 2021: [Seal Case]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Indictment]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 17, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.