U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 01, 2022: [Service by Publication]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 27, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 18, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • February 10, 2022: [Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
  • January 04, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 20, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Suppress]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.