U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Plowden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Service by Publication]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Claim]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 25, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 25, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 21, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • July 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 06, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 01, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.