U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00170-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McInnis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
December, 2021
  • December 11, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Service by Publication]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 06, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
September, 2021
  • September 25, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 05, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 04, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arrest]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.