U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drayton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 14, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 02, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 02, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Factual Basis]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 16, 2021: [Indictment]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.