U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 19, 2022: [Transcript - Sealed]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 22, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • September 21, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 17, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.