U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00165-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 03, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • December 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 18, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 18, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 18, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.