U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 15, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 15, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 26, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.