U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00235-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunt et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • March 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • December 28, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Text Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Document]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2021: [Remark]
  • November 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 10, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • June 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • June 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.