U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00254-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richardson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [SEALED Order]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 12, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 12, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • December 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Text Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 13, 2021: [Detention]
  • December 13, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.