U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lakes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 25, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 24, 2021: [Seal ]
  • November 24, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • November 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 25, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.