U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Price
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 08, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Document]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 07, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • August 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • July 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 22, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 25, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.