U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nieves
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Seal ]
  • March 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 07, 2022: [Seal ]
  • February 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.