U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. George
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Judgment on 2255]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment on 2255]
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment on Motion to Vacate (2255) ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 10, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Declaration of Mistrial ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for New Trial ]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 24, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 27, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 27, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Declaration of Mistrial ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • April 20, 2022: [New Trial ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Ex Parte Document]
  • April 06, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • April 06, 2022: [Jury Verdict ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Jury Trial ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Acquittal ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Jury Seating Arrangement]
  • April 05, 2022: [Jury Trial ]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Jury Impaneled]
  • April 05, 2022: [Voir Dire and Jury Trial]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for evidence under Rule 404(b)]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sequester]
  • March 31, 2022: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • March 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 24, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • March 24, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 24, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • March 24, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 23, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • March 23, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 23, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • March 21, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sequester]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice-other]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 11, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 11, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 21, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • October 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 13, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 31, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.