U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 28, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 13, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • March 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Document]
  • December 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 27, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • October 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.