U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00259-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • May 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 23, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 20, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 18, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Stay]
  • January 17, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 11, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 11, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Jury Trial ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Jury Selection]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Recusal ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2023: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Reply to Response ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 03, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 03, 2023: [Release Status Report]
  • January 02, 2023: [Notice-other]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Recusal]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • December 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 20, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 05, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion For Statements of Witness(es)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reveal]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for evidence under Rule 404(b)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Preserve ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • November 28, 2022: [Appear]
  • November 25, 2022: [Discovery ]
  • November 25, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • November 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 25, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Compel ]
  • September 12, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Preserve ]
  • August 26, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • August 26, 2022: [Motion to Reveal]
  • August 26, 2022: [Strike ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Motion For Statements of Witness(es)]
  • August 26, 2022: [Discovery ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2022: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 05, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 05, 2022: [Indictment ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 02, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • August 03, 2021: [USPO Notice of Filing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 12, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Special Appearance - Defendant - Non-District Counsel]
  • June 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.