U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00258-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carmichael
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Detention Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 05, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.