U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00256-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Statement Regarding Substantial Assistance]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 08, 2022: [Release Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 09, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2022: [Seal ]
  • May 06, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • March 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • March 01, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • February 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 20, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Bond Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.