U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00255-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Milton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Document]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • May 12, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.