U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tisdale
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 19, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [Arrest]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Prob12D - Order on Request for Summons and Modificiation of Cond/Term of Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.