U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chapman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 16, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • December 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [SEALED Transcript]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 07, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • July 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 27, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [2255 Letter]
  • June 10, 2022: [Vacate (2255) ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Vacate (2255) ]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • April 12, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 05, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 07, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
  • December 07, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 07, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice-other]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 24, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • September 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • August 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 17, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.