U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:95-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Locklear, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment on 2255]
  • February 24, 2022: [Judgment on Motion to Vacate (2255) ]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment on 2255]
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment on Motion to Vacate (2255) ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [2255 Letter]
  • September 28, 2021: [Vacate (2255) ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [2255 Letter]
  • September 16, 2021: [Vacate (2255) ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 19, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Vacate (2255) ]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Simmons Correspondence]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.