U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 11, 2023: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 03, 2023: [USCA Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 28, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 22, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 07, 2022: [Document]
  • July 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • June 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel- Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 22, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 21, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.