U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 18, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • June 21, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • June 21, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.