U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lowery
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 04, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 04, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Remark]
  • June 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.