U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blalock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Annual Accounting of Garnishment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2023: [Annual Accounting of Garnishment]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order/Writ on Motion for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • August 04, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 04, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2022: [Annual Accounting of Garnishment]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • November 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 21, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • September 30, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 25, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 17, 2021: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment/Execution and Instructions]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order/Writ on Motion for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • July 14, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 14, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.