U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00262-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 16, 2021: [Seal ]
  • July 16, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • June 22, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 22, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.