U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00266-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Seal ]
  • June 14, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Seal ]
  • April 25, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 14, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [SEALED Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Document]
  • March 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 31, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 31, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 11, 2022: [Release Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 15, 2021: [Revoke]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 24, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 24, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.