U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanberg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Modification to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 17, 2022: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 01, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 16, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 24, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.