U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00263-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice-other]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice-other]
  • October 11, 2024: [Seal ]
  • October 11, 2024: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • October 04, 2024: [Reminder to Counsel - Judge Boyle]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Seal ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
  • December 29, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 29, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 15, 2021: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report - Draft]
  • November 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 18, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 17, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 24, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 24, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.