U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Himbry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 21, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notification to Appeals Court of Filing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • October 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 24, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 24, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.