U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reybein
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 10, 2022: [Release Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • April 02, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • April 01, 2022: [Remark]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice-other]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 16, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Bond Hearing ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 24, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.