U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 11, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 08, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 01, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 24, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.