U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00269-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • January 23, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2022: [Motion for Revocation of Probation]
  • November 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.