U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00268-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 07, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 28, 2022: [Seal ]
  • November 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 10, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.