U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDuffie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [SEALED Order]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 07, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 07, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • August 06, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 05, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • August 04, 2021: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2021: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.