U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • September 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • June 24, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.