U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00267-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mallette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • January 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2021: [Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.