U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00550-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tolentino-San Agustin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 28, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.