U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gaspar-Diaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 02, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 28, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.