U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [SEALED Appeal Transcript ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 01, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Request]
  • March 18, 2025: [USCA Order]
November, 2024
  • November 30, 2024: [Objection to PSI]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion Hearing ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Dismiss ]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 14, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 02, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Suppress ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 03, 2022: [Compel ]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • February 08, 2022: [SEALED Document]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 14, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motion No Longer Submitted]
  • January 03, 2022: [Motion Referred]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.