U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alexander
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 19, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 19, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • July 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 16, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Release Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 24, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • June 24, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.