U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00274-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pittman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Document]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Document]
  • June 28, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • February 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 25, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.