U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ellis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Response]
  • April 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 31, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Motion Referred]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • August 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.