U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00272-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sauls
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 25, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 25, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • June 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.