U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00271-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smalls
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Text Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 28, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 29, 2022: [Revoke]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 30, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 30, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Seal ]
  • January 31, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 13, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • January 13, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 13, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Seal ]
  • January 13, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 07, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
  • December 07, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 07, 2021: [Seal ]
  • December 07, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 24, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 18, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 02, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • June 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.