U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00270-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sinclair
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 18, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 18, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 30, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 30, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice-other]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • July 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 19, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 11, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • July 11, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • June 25, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 25, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 25, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.