U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SAMUEL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Case Assigned]
  • October 19, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.