U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCALL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
January, 2025
  • January 26, 2025: [SEALED USPO Memorandum Re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • January 12, 2025: [SEALED Response]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Sentencing]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Case Reassigned]
  • January 06, 2023: [(ELECTRONIC) NOTICE OF HEARING FOR CRIMINAL TERM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Status Report ]
  • January 02, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • November 01, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • November 01, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • November 01, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 05, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 04, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 23, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (Not Sealed)]
  • September 19, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • September 15, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • September 01, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 26, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • August 15, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
  • June 29, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 22, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 21, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • June 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • June 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Appeal Transcript]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • June 01, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Status Report ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • May 31, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 31, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • May 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • May 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • May 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • April 28, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • April 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Reporting Date to Prison]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • April 27, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • April 26, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 21, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 21, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • April 21, 2022: [Arrest]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2022: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • February 14, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • February 14, 2022: [Arrest]
  • February 01, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 24, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • January 20, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • January 12, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 10, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • January 04, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2021: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 23, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • November 22, 2021: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 16, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • November 10, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 09, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • November 03, 2021: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 18, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 18, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [SEALED Notice of Apparent Violation]
  • October 07, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 05, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [SEALED Order on SEALED Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [SEALED Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 16, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 30, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 30, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Oral Motion]
  • July 30, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 22, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 20, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • July 15, 2021: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • July 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.