U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00223-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POTEAT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 09, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 17, 2022: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 07, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 24, 2022: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • February 10, 2022: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2021: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • September 01, 2021: [Status Report ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 27, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.